Player Profile
Matic Hajdic
Previous Seasons
Competition | Season | M | Last | YC | RC | GOALS |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mens Premier League Reserves | 2024 | 7 | 2024-08-30 | 1 | ||
Hellenic Athletic Club | 2024 | 7 | 2024-08-30 | 1 | ||
3RD Division Men | 2024 | 7 | 2024-09-21 | |||
Hellenic Athletic Club | 2024 | 7 | 2024-09-21 | |||
Mens Premier League Reserves 2022 | 2022 | 6 | 2022-08-28 | 1 | ||
Hellenic Athletic Club | 2022 | 6 | 2022-08-28 | 1 | ||
Division One Men's League 2022 | 2022 | 9 | 2022-10-01 | 1 | 2 | |
Hellenic Athletic Club | 2022 | 9 | 2022-10-01 | 1 | 2 | |
Division One Men's League 2021 | 2021 | 8 | 2021-09-18 | 1 | ||
Hellenic Athletic Club | 2021 | 8 | 2021-09-18 | 1 | ||
Mens Division One | 2020 | 1 | 2020-06-12 | |||
Hellenic Athletic Club | 2020 | 1 | 2020-06-12 | |||
2016 All-Age Men's League | 2016 | 13 | 2016-08-28 | 2 | 3 | |
Darwin Olympic Sporting Club | 2016 | 13 | 2016-08-28 | 2 | 3 | |
2015 Under 21s Premier League | 2015 | 5 | 2015-08-15 | 1 | ||
Palmerston Rovers Football Club Inc | 2015 | 5 | 2015-08-15 | 1 | ||
2015 Men's Premier League | 2015 | 13 | 2015-08-11 | 2 | ||
Palmerston Rovers Football Club Inc | 2015 | 13 | 2015-08-11 | 2 | ||
Mens Division 2 2013 | 2013 | 1 | 2013-08-18 | |||
Mindil Aces Football Club | 2013 | 1 | 2013-08-18 | |||
Mens Division 1 2013 | 2013 | 13 | 2013-09-01 | 1 | ||
Mindil Aces Football Club | 2013 | 13 | 2013-09-01 | 1 | ||
Mens Reserve League 2012 | 2012 | 4 | 2012-09-15 | 1 | ||
Darwin Olympic Sporting Club | 2012 | 4 | 2012-09-15 | 1 | ||
Mens Premier League 2012 | 2012 | 5 | 2012-09-01 | |||
Darwin Olympic Sporting Club | 2012 | 5 | 2012-09-01 |